+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 49
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:12 pmobject
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: WM
- Amendment passed: RULES
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass amended
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (3)
Ways and Means
House Proposed Amendment
Rules
House Proposed Amendment
Ways and Means
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 18, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
February 17, 2015: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
February 5, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 2
January 15, 2015: Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 15, 2015: Ways and Means: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor