+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On June 30, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Failed to pass
- Amendment passed: GOV
- Final disposition: Failed in committee of whole
On June 29, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On June 26, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 27, 2009 in the House:
- Government: Do pass amended
On January 21, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
Government
House Adopted Amendment
Government
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
January 20, 2009: Government: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
January 20, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor