+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 206
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: CWD (ref Bill)
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Commerce amd Workforce Development: Do pass amended
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce amd Workforce Development
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Petersen
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 2:15 pmobject
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (3)
Commerce and Workforce Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce and Workforce Development
Senate Adopted Amendment
Petersen Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 31, 2015: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
March 30, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
February 17, 2015: Commerce amd Workforce Development: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
February 3, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
January 15, 2015: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
January 15, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor