+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On June 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On May 28, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
- Rfeir action sections
- Y passed 1
On May 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 3:15 pm
On January 22, 2009 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On January 15, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
6-12 fin
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (4)
June 8, 2009: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
May 28, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Present/NV: 4
January 15, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
January 15, 2009: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor