+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Government Institutions: Do pass
On June 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government Institutions
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On June 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 9, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On May 14, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Lesko
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On May 4, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 12, 2009 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On January 21, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (5)
Lesko Floor amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Government Institutions
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government Institutions
Senate Proposed Amendment
2125GOV
Senate Fact Sheet
Lesko Floor amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
June 11, 2009: Government Institutions: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
June 9, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
January 20, 2009: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
January 20, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor