+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 16, 2007 in the House:
- Final disposition: None
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 213
- Action: Signed
On May 10, 2007 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
On May 9, 2007 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On May 1, 2007 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 26, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: HEALTH (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On March 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Health: Do pass amended
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Senate first read
On March 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 6, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 5, 2007 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Health - Stump
- Amendment: HEALTH - passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Judiciary: Withdrawn
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Health: Do pass amended
On January 17, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 16, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Health
- House first read
+ − Amendments (14)
Health
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government
Senate Adopted Amendment
Stump Floor amendment, reference to the Health Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Health
House Adopted Amendment
Health
Senate Proposed Amendment
Health
Senate Proposed Amendment
Health
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government
Senate Adopted Amendment
Health
House Adopted Amendment
Stump Floor amendment, reference to the Health Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Health
Senate Proposed Amendment
Health
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
May 10, 2007: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
April 26, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 4
March 7, 2007: Health: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 6, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 3
January 16, 2007: Health: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
January 16, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor