+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 29
- Action: Signed
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:15 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to IR - Lovas
- Amendment passed: IR
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Insurance and Retirement: Do pass amended
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Insurance and Retirement
- House first read
+ − Amendments (7)
Lovas Floor Amendment; Reference to INSURANCE AND RETIREMENT Commitee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Insurance and Retirement
House Proposed Amendment
Insurance and Retirement
House Adopted Amendment
Insurance and Retirement
House Proposed Amendment
Lovas Floor Amendment; Reference to INSURANCE AND RETIREMENT Commitee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Insurance and Retirement
House Adopted Amendment
2-24 fin
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 9, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
February 19, 2014: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
February 18, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 60
January 22, 2014: Insurance and Retirement: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
January 22, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor