+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- HB 2119 substituted for SB 1075. Motion carried.: PASSED
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Bolick - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:45PM.
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass.
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 11, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
February 8, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
January 20, 2021: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 10
January 20, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor