+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: amended constitutional and in proper form.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- RULES - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee: do pass.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 14, 2017: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
February 23, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 25
January 12, 2017: House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee
- Yeas: 6
January 12, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3