+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred.
- Final reading in House: Passed
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Conference committee recommended.
- House Minority Caucus.
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- GOV (ref Bill) adopted
- Farnsworth flr amend (ref GOV) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass amended.
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 4:58PM.
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee: do pass.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
May 8, 2017: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 59
March 28, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
February 16, 2017: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 2, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 5
January 12, 2017: House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee
- Yeas: 6
January 12, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor