+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass amended.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- GHE
- SUB Floor Amend to GHE - Petersen - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- House Government and Higher Education Committee: do pass amended.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Government and Higher Education Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (8)
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government and Higher Education
House Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Adopted Amendment
SUB Floor Amend to GHE - Petersen - passed
House Adopted Amendment
Government and Higher Education
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
February 23, 2016: Judiciary: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
February 23, 2016: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 18, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 3
February 18, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 23
January 19, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
January 19, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
January 19, 2016: House Government and Higher Education Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
January 19, 2016: Government and Higher Education: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor