+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 16, 2007 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 65
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Final disposition: None
On April 10, 2007 in the House:
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 5, 2007 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 3, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Blendu flr amend (ref Bill)
On March 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Health: Do pass
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On January 30, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On January 25, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Amended by HEALTH
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Stump
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On January 17, 2007 in the House:
- Health: Do pass amended
- House second read
On January 16, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (8)
Blendu Floor Amendment, reference to House engrossed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Health
House Adopted Amendment
Stump Floor Amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Blendu Floor Amendment, reference to House engrossed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Health
House Adopted Amendment
Stump Floor Amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
4-3 as passed senate
Senate Fact Sheet
2-27 health
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 10, 2007: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 2
April 3, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 2
February 12, 2007: Health: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
January 30, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 4
January 16, 2007: Health: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 10
January 16, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1