+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:12PM.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass.
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Amended by WM - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on Committee of the Whole consent calendar at 5:41PM.
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- House Ways and Means Committee: do pass amended.
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Ways and Means Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 13, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
February 15, 2018: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 5
February 8, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 57
January 16, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 16, 2018: House Ways and Means Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor