+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- Governor Action: Vetoed
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:08PM.
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass.
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 5:43PM.
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee: do pass.
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (5)
March 28, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 14
February 15, 2018: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
February 6, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 3
January 16, 2018: House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 16, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor