+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:15PM.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Thorpe - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 4:58PM.
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee: do pass.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 16, 2017: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
February 8, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 24
January 12, 2017: House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
January 12, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9