+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 6, 2016 in the House:
- House concurred.
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 6, 2016 in the House:
- Final reading in House: Passed
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Conference committee recommended.
- House Minority Caucus.
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- CWD (ref Bill) adopted
- Yee flr amend (ref CWD) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- COM - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass amended.
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (8)
Commerce and Workforce Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce
House Proposed Amendment
Yee flr amend (ref CWD) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Workforce Development - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (12)
May 6, 2016: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 6
May 6, 2016: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 22
March 29, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 2
March 29, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 5
February 16, 2016: Commerce and Workforce Development: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
February 16, 2016: Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
February 4, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 22
February 4, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 4
January 13, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
January 13, 2016: Commerce: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
January 13, 2016: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
January 13, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor