+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- Third read in House: Failed
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 5:45PM.
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- House Government Committee: do pass.
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Government Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (3)
February 9, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 29
January 17, 2017: House Government Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
January 17, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8