+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Natural Resources Committee: held.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Natural Resources Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- COM
- SUB Floor Amend to COM - Petersen - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass amended.
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (6)
Natural Resources - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce
House Proposed Amendment
SUB Floor Amend to COM - Petersen - passed
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 7, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 21
March 7, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 3
January 13, 2016: Commerce: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
January 13, 2016: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
January 13, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
January 13, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor