+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 6
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Transmitted to: Governor
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transportation: Do pass
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: TRANS
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Transportation: Do pass amended
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (5)
Transportation
House Proposed Amendment
Transportation
House Adopted Amendment
Transportation
House Proposed Amendment
Transportation
House Adopted Amendment
2-21 trans
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
February 27, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 8
February 19, 2014: Transportation: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
February 18, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 12
January 22, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 22, 2014: Transportation: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor