+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Conference committee recommended.
- House Minority Caucus.
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- CWD (ref Bill) adopted
- RULES (ref CWD) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration amended.
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee: do pass amended.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- COM - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass amended.
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (8)
Commerce and Workforce Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce
House Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Workforce Development
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
April 11, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 12
April 11, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
February 16, 2016: Commerce and Workforce Development: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
February 16, 2016: Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
January 28, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 22
January 28, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 3
January 13, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
January 13, 2016: Commerce: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
January 13, 2016: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
January 13, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor