+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Final reading in House: Passed
- House concurred.
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
- Transmit to House.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- NREW (ref Bill) adopted
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee: do pass amended.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Representative Finchem moved that the House reconsider HB 2112 within the next14 days. Motion passed by v/v
- Third read in House: Failed
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 5:45PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee: do pass.
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
May 8, 2017: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 21
April 26, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 6
February 28, 2017: Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
February 27, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 25
January 17, 2017: House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
January 17, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor