+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Bill - Carter - passed
- Floor Amend to Bill - Friese - failed by s/v 24-31
- Amended by APPROP - passed
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass amended.
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- House Education Committee: do pass.
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
February 20, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 12
January 11, 2018: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
January 11, 2018: House Education Committee
- Yeas: 10
January 11, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor