+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate State Debt and Budget Reform Committee: do pass amended.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate State Debt and Budget Reform Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Cardenas - failed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 4:10PM.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
State Debt and Budget Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
State Debt and Budget Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
February 16, 2016: Senate State Debt and Budget Reform Committee
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
February 16, 2016: State Debt and Budget Reform: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
February 9, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 23
February 9, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 2
January 19, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 19, 2016: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 5
January 19, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 19, 2016: Appropriations: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor