+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:15PM.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Amended by GE - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- House Government & Elections Committee: do pass amended.
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- House Judiciary Committee: withdrawn.
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Judiciary Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Government & Elections Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
March 30, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 13
March 2, 2021: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
February 24, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 29
January 14, 2021: House Government & Elections Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 6
January 14, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor