+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:08PM.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce Committee: do pass.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Commerce Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 3:17PM.
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass.
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (5)
March 18, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 1
February 18, 2021: Senate Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 28, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
January 14, 2021: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 10
January 14, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8