+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 16
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Melvin flr amend (ref Bill)
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:22 pmobject
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce, Energy and Military
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Dial
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (5)
Melvin flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Dial Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Melvin flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Dial Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
2-25 cem
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
March 27, 2013: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
March 19, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
February 19, 2013: Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
February 13, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
January 22, 2013: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
January 22, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor