+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 3:17PM.
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass.
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (2)
January 14, 2021: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
January 14, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor