+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 4:10PM.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- House Ways and Means Committee: withdrawn.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- House Education Committee: do pass.
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Ways and Means Committee.
+ − Votes (6)
February 4, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 18
February 4, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 4
January 13, 2016: Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
January 13, 2016: House Education Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
January 13, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 13, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor