+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Final reading in Senate: Passed
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- House adopted conference committee report.
- Final reading in House: Passed
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- House caucus on conference committee report.
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted conference committee report.
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate caucus on conference committee report.
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Conference committee recommendation: That the House accept the Senate amendments and the bill be further amended.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate members appointed to conference committee: MONTENEGRO, PRATT, MIRANDA
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- House members appointed to conference committee: BOYER, BOLDING, SHOPE
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Conference committee recommended.
- House Minority Caucus.
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- ED (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass amended.
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 4:58PM.
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House Education Committee: do pass.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
April 24, 2017: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 29
April 20, 2017: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 56
March 16, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
February 16, 2017: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 2, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
January 12, 2017: House Education Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 12, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor