+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 11, 2008 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 21
- Action: Signed
On April 7, 2008 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 3, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 11:45 am
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On February 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On February 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 18, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 12, 2008 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 10:30 am
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 4, 2008 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass
On January 15, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On January 14, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- House first read
+ − Amendment
3-10 fin
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 3, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
February 26, 2008: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
February 18, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 53
- Present/NV: 7
January 14, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
January 14, 2008: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1