+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 84
- Action: Signed
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Driggs flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Barto flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment withdrawn: RULES (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
- Senate first read
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: COM
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to COM - Kavanagh
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass amended
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- House first read
+ − Amendments (11)
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Driggs flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Barto flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Adopted Amendment
Kavanagh Substitute Floor Amendment to the Commerce Committee Amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Driggs flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Kavanagh Substitute Floor Amendment to the Commerce Committee Amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Barto flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Adopted Amendment
3-7 hmlr
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 11, 2011: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 2
April 6, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
March 2, 2011: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
March 1, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 3
January 18, 2011: Commerce: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
January 18, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor