+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 22, 2008 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 60
- Action: Signed
On April 16, 2008 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
On April 15, 2008 in the House:
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 10, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Waring flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: FIN (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass amended
On February 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Senate second read
On February 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On January 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On January 31, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On January 29, 2008 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On January 28, 2008 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 11:00 am
On January 23, 2008 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 17, 2008 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass
On January 15, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On January 14, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- House first read
+ − Amendments (10)
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Waring Floor Amendment; reference to House engrossed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Waring Floor Amendment; reference to House engrossed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-13 caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
4-10 as passed senate
Senate Fact Sheet
4-25 asenacted
Senate Fact Sheet
3-10 fin
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 16, 2008: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
April 10, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 2
February 26, 2008: Finance: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
January 31, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 60
January 14, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
January 14, 2008: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1