+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Financial Institutions, Insurance and Retirement: Held
On March 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Financial Institutions, Insurance and Retirement
- Senate second read
On March 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Transmit to Senate
On March 24, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 20, 2008 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: FII - W/D
- Amendment passed: WM
On March 18, 2008 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 11, 2008 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass amended
On February 4, 2008 in the House:
- Financial Institutions and Insurance: Do pass amended
On January 15, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On January 14, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Financial Institutions and Insurance
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- House first read
+ − Amendments (7)
Financial Institutions, Insurance and Retirement - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Ways and Means
House Adopted Amendment
Financial Institutions and Insurance
House Adopted Amendment
Financial Institutions, Insurance and Retirement - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Financial Institutions and Insurance
House Adopted Amendment
Ways and Means
House Adopted Amendment
4-3 fiir-strikermemo
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (4)
March 24, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 6
January 14, 2008: Financial Institutions and Insurance: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
January 14, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
January 14, 2008: Ways and Means: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor