+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government and Environment
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: GOV
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Hale
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Government: Do pass amended
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (6)
Government
House Proposed Amendment
Hale Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Government
House Adopted Amendment
Government
House Proposed Amendment
Hale Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Government
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 18, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 3
January 22, 2014: Government: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
January 22, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor