+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 134
- Action: Signed
On July 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Hb 2101 substituted for sb 1442 on third reading.
- Miscellaneous motion
On June 26, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
- Rules: Withdrawn
- Government Institutions: Withdrawn
On June 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government Institutions
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On May 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On May 28, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Amendment passed: GOV
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Government: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On January 15, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- House first read
+ − Amendments (4)
Government - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
June 25, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 4
May 28, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 4
January 15, 2009: Government: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
January 15, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8