+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 259
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: HHS (ref Bill)
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass amended
- Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Technology
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: RULES
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Brophy McGee
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Children and Family Affairs: Do pass
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Children and Family Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Health and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Health and Human Services
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
House Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill - Brophy McGee - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
April 2, 2015: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
April 2, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 3, 2015: Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
March 3, 2015: Health and Human Services: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
February 26, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 2
January 20, 2015: Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 20, 2015: Children and Family Affairs: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor