+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 130
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Government and Environment: Do pass
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government and Environment
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: GOV
- Third read: Passed
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Government: Do pass amended
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Government
House Proposed Amendment
Government
House Adopted Amendment
Government
House Proposed Amendment
Government
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 17, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 3
March 3, 2014: Government and Environment: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 27, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Present/NV: 5
January 22, 2014: Government: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
January 22, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor