+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Third read: Failed
On May 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On May 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On May 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On March 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On March 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Senate second read
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On March 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 7, 2008 in the House:
- Amendment passed: WM
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 5, 2008 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 28, 2008 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass amended
On January 15, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On January 14, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- House first read
+ − Amendments (5)
Ways and Means
House Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Ways and Means
House Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-24fin
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
June 18, 2008: Third read: failed (Senate)
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 9
March 6, 2008: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
March 3, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 1
January 14, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
January 14, 2008: Ways and Means: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor