+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- WM - passed
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- House Government Committee: do pass.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- House Ways & Means Committee: do pass amended.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Government Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Ways & Means Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
March 6, 2019: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
March 4, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
January 24, 2019: House Government Committee
- Yeas: 11
January 24, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 24, 2019: House Ways & Means Committee
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor