+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- FPRPP - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee: do pass amended.
- Second read in House.
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 1, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 22
January 12, 2017: House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
January 12, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor