+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass.
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 9:27PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- House Government Committee: do pass.
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- House Ways & Means Committee: do pass.
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Government Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Ways & Means Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (6)
May 8, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 10
March 5, 2019: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
March 4, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 22
January 23, 2019: House Government Committee
- Yeas: 11
January 23, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
January 23, 2019: House Ways & Means Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor