+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transportation: Do pass
On March 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended
On February 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Senate second read
On February 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Representative boone moved that the House reconsider hb 2096 on thursday, february 22, 2007. motion passed by v/v.
- Motion
- Vote detail 33 25 2 0 y passed
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Failed
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Amendment passed: JUD
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended
On January 25, 2007 in the House:
- Transportation: Withdrawn
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- House first read
+ − Amendments (9)
Judiciary
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Adopted Amendment
4-2 corrected caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Judiciary
House Adopted Amendment
3-7jud-trans
Senate Fact Sheet
3-28 caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
February 27, 2007: Judiciary: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
February 27, 2007: Transportation: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 3
- Present/NV: 2
February 22, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 2
February 19, 2007: Third read: failed (House)
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 5
January 22, 2007: Judiciary: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 4
January 22, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor