+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:10PM.
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee: do pass.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: amended constitutional and in proper form.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- EENR - passed
- RULES - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee: do pass amended.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
April 26, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 11
February 28, 2017: Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
February 23, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 25
January 12, 2017: House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
January 12, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor