+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Final reading in House: PASSED
- House concurred.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- FIN (ref Bill) adopted
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass amended.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 5:20PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- House Land & Agriculture Committee: do pass.
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- House Ways & Means Committee: do pass.
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Land & Agriculture Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Ways & Means Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
April 3, 2019: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 59
March 26, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
February 25, 2019: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 14, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 60
January 23, 2019: House Ways & Means Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 23, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 23, 2019: House Land & Agriculture Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor