+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Held
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Senate second read
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On January 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On January 30, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 11:00 am
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On January 16, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 11, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- House first read
+ − Amendments (3)
Judiciary - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
3-22 jud strikermemo
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (3)
January 30, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Present/NV: 4
January 11, 2007: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 10
January 11, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1