+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: withdrawn.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass.
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 4:58PM.
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- House Health Committee: do pass.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (5)
May 10, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 9
February 16, 2017: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
February 6, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 18
January 12, 2017: House Health Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 12, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor