+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 200
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Technology
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 2:15 pm
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (6)
April 2, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
February 25, 2015: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
February 25, 2015: Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
January 29, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
January 15, 2015: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 15, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1