+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- NREW (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in Senate: Failed
- Senator Yee moved that the Senate reconsider its action whereby it failed to pass HB 2090 on Third Reading on May 9, 2017. Motion carried.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: withdrawn.
- Referred to Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- HEALTH - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on Committee of the Whole consent calendar at 2:14PM.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- House Health Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
May 9, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 15
March 15, 2017: Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
February 21, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
January 12, 2017: House Health Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 12, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor