+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On April 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On April 4, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On March 29, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee: do pass amended.
On February 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee.
On February 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 21, 2023 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 14, 2023 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2023 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:00PM.
On January 30, 2023 in the House:
- House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On January 18, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 17, 2023 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 27, 2023: Senate Appropriations1 Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
February 27, 2023: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
February 27, 2023: Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
February 21, 2023: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 60
January 17, 2023: House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 15
January 17, 2023: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor