+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 276
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: JUD (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Driggs flr amend (ref Bill)
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: JUD
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (7)
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
House Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Adopted Amendment
Driggs flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 31, 2015: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 30, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
March 9, 2015: Judiciary: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
February 26, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
January 20, 2015: Judiciary: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 1
January 20, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2